THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:25:19 PM
Koshak, Christina Lynn
CPSO#:
84997
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Goldstein, Christina Lynn (used until: 01 Mar 2023 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.L. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Missouri
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2023 |