THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:55:00 PM
Apriasz, Izabela
CPSO#:
84981
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON P8N 2Z6
Phone: 1-807-223-8200
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IZABELA APRIASZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRIASZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
AVP - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2013 |