THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:52:03 AM
Nassar, Aussama Khalaf
CPSO#:
84976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Pasteur Drive, H3639
Stanford CA 94305
United States
Phone: (650) 725-1097
Fax: (650) 725-1216
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Aussama Nassar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AUSSAMA KHALAF NASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |