THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:58:32 AM
Tsampalieros, Anne Kathryn
CPSO#:
84969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:30 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE KATHRYN TSAMPALIEROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAMPALIEROS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2012 |