THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:32:19 AM
Silva, Cecilia Veronica
CPSO#:
84968
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: UNIVERSIDAD EVANGELICA DE EL SALVADOR, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
404-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Nephrology Clinic
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 9052721104
Fax: 9052721105
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Veronica Silva Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CECILIA VERONICA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Sep 2010 to 20 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2011 |