THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:13:49 AM
Izard, Jason Patrick
CPSO#:
84919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Urology - Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2493
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON PATRICK IZARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |