THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:45:21 PM
Szpakowski, Pawel Piotr
CPSO#:
84866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8L 5G4
Phone: 289-389-8181
Fax: 289-389-8111
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:05 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAWEL PIOTR SZPAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2008 |