THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:27:36 AM
Bishara, Phoebe Roshdy Youssif
CPSO#:
84860
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 19
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 579-6767
Fax: (519) 579-6763
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHOEBE ROSHDY YOUSSIF BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2010 |