THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:14:26 AM
Metawee, Mohamed Lotfy Mohamed
CPSO#:
84837
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trinity cardioligy
3091 willams street
Buffalo NY 14227
United States
Phone: 7168223098
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Metawee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Tennessee
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Jan 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED LOTFY MOHAMED METAWEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METAWEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2010 |