THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:43:36 AM
Chauhan, Rebecca Anne
CPSO#:
84806
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
3rd floor, D324, forensic dept
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39554
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2021
Corporation Name: DR. REBECCA CHAUHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2022
Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 6 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2013 |