THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:27:28 AM
Beck, Vance Philip
CPSO#:
84779
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:22 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2008 to 25 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2013 |