THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:16:28 PM
Papneja, Tripti
CPSO#:
84778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
195 County Court Blvd
Suite 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
Phone: 9057991850 Ext. 4
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Papneja's medical records can be obtained by contacting her office at 905 799 1850.
Date Received: 25 Jul 2012
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:05 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRIPTI PAPNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPNEJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2011 to 06 Feb 2011
EL - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2011 |