THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:41:37 PM
Takach Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar
CPSO#:
84741
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Lapner, Sarah Louise Dunbar Takach (used until: 15 Jun 2012 )
Takach, Sarah Louise Dunbar (used until: 25 Nov 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:28 Feb 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |