THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:09:18 PM
Klevan, Ariel
CPSO#:
84734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
790 Bay Street
PO Box 71
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: (416) 551-6009
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARIEL KLEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |