THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:36:32 AM
Verbeeten, Karen Michelle
CPSO#:
84723
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1C - 572
585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 807-8018
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN MICHELLE VERBEETEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBEETEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2011 |