THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:23:08 AM
Sulowski, Christopher Andrew
CPSO#:
84710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main St. W
2N49
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75607
Fax: (905) 524-5707
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW SULOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2010 |