THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:46:07 PM
Stewart, Brian Gibson
CPSO#:
84707
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 837-6401
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp |
Palmerston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN GIBSON STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2012 |