THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:42:05 PM
Shawyer, Anna Catherine
CPSO#:
84699
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
671 William Ave
HSC
Department of Surgery
AE-402, Harry Medovy House
Winnipeg MB R3E 0Z2
Phone: 2047872394
Fax: 2047872028
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:4E2 McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:04 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2014 |