THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:26:56 PM
Sharan, Sapna
CPSO#:
84623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8795
Fax: (519) 646-6094
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:10 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |