THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:32:57 PM
Lo, Alexander John
CPSO#:
84603
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3944
Fax: (416) 597-7107
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:04 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER JOHN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 04 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2009 to 04 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2010 to 04 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2011 |