THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:59:01 AM
Cacic, Ivan
CPSO#:
84266
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3946
Fax: (905) 813-1515
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN CACIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2011 |