THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:35:06 PM
Al-Breiki, Danah Hassan Mohd Saleh
CPSO#:
84177
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Eye Institute
General Campus
501 Chemin Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 739-6805
Fax: (613) 739-6889
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANAH HASSAN MOHD SALEH AL-BREIKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BREIKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2010 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2012 |