THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:41:55 PM
Podhradsky, Ludek
CPSO#:
83815
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Slovak
Education: Charles Univ Prague, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201 Ext. 3248
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Podhradsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUDEK PODHRADSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODHRADSKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2014 |