THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:00:31 AM
Yeung, Robert
CPSO#:
83681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
AG31c-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89324
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |