THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:10:44 AM
Tzemos, Nikolaos
CPSO#:
83573
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek, Italian
Education: University of Milan, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3038
Fax: (519) 663-3002
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Feb 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 14 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2017 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Mar 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |