THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:44:49 AM
Kathuria, Sangeet
CPSO#:
83468
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 11-12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: 9054977707
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jan 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANGEET KATHURIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHURIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2005 to 26 Sep 2005
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |