THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:48:08 AM
Harish, Srinivasan
CPSO#:
83316
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SRINIVASAN HARISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARISH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2008 |