THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:52:00 AM
Magloire, Patrick Morales
CPSO#:
81847
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Rm 520 5th Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44252
Fax: (905) 577-1490
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Patrick Magloire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:19 Sep 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 22 Oct 2004
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
|
Active |