THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:27:30 AM
Gilloteaux, Laurent Christophe
CPSO#:
81765
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: NORTHEASTERN OHIO UNIVERSITIES, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UVM Health Network - CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh, NY12901
Plattsburgh NY 12901
United States
Phone: (518) 562-7500
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Laurent Gilloteaux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2019
Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURENT CHRISTOPHE GILLOTEAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLOTEAUX is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |