THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:08:21 AM
Chirayilkalam, Shereen Brajit
CPSO#:
81645
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu
Education: University of Kerala, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
153 Perry Street
Whitby ON L1N 4B7
Phone: (905) 666-0500
Fax: (905) 666-0400
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:20 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHEREEN BRAJIT CHIRAYILKALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIRAYILKALAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2009 |