THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:53:55 AM
Vora, Parag Kanaiyalal
CPSO#:
81610
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Bombay, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Department of Radiology,
PO Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARAG KANAIYALAL VORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2021 |