THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:21:54 PM
Narewal, Mondeep
CPSO#:
81393
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
WRH Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONDEEP NAREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAREWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2013 |