THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:48:33 AM
Mondal, Tapas Kumar
CPSO#:
80525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Oriya
Education: University of Calcutta, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
Pediatric Cardiology 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75259
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2004 to 09 Apr 2004
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |