THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:24:37 AM
Ha, Andrew Chun Tung
CPSO#:
77634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peter Munk Cardiac Center
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street 3GW-558A
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5206
Fax: (416) 340-3340
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:19 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHUN TUNG HA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2008 |