THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:24:38 PM
Hotte, Simon Laurier
CPSO#:
77464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-165 St-Raymond
Gatineau QC J8Y 0A7
Phone: (819) 282-7090
Fax: (819) 770-8686
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Aug 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:20 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMON LAURIER HOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOTTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2007 |