THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:28:41 AM
Falkson, Conrad Bif
CPSO#:
76042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Apr 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
28 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Oncology
CCSEO at KHSC
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4509
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:18 Mar 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONRAD BIF FALKSON may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. FALKSON holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. FALKSON may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. FALKSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2005 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Jun 2005 |