THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:13:56 PM
James, Adrian Lewis
CPSO#:
75783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Di, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave Rm 6103
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2190
Fax: (416) 813-5036
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:11 Mar 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
|
Active |