THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:45:19 AM
Best, Kerri Lee
CPSO#:
75245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 9059852895
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kerri Best Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KERRI LEE BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 02 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 30 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2003 |