THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:39:57 PM
Khandelwal, Mukesh Kumar Nandlalji
CPSO#:
74451
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Nagpur University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5, 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 734-6111
Fax: 905 688 4646
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:22 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUKESH KUMAR NANDLALJI KHANDELWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANDELWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jan 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |