THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:49:38 AM
Amin, Shilpa
CPSO#:
73115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Jain, Shilpa (used until: 08 Sep 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Manitoba, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHILPA AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Oct 1998 to 16 Dec 1998
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1999 to 20 Oct 1999
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 1999 to 15 Dec 1999
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2002 |