THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:28:01 AM
Long, Briar Allyn
CPSO#:
71670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
J T Powell Building
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519 821-2308
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAR ALLYN LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |