THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
22/04/24 19:04:51 PM
Zia, Peter Kai Yuan
CPSO#:
71413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER KAI YUAN ZIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2000 |