THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:19:12 PM
Benjamin, Marcia Dawn
CPSO#:
71280
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Warnock, Marcia Dawn (used until: 06 Apr 2000 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 210
15 Gallie Court
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-9843
Fax: (705) 728-8476
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCIA DAWN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2004 |