THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:31:15 AM
Upadhye, Suneel
CPSO#:
70441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Ewen Rd
Hamilton ON L8S 3C4
Phone: 905 393 0024
Fax: 905 393 0025
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNEEL UPADHYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPADHYE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2021 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Jun 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jan 2021
Summary:
On February 7, 2020, allegations of Dr. Upadhye’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Upadhye engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
The matter was heard on January 15, 2021 by way of videoconference in the presence of counsel for the College, Dr. Upadhye, and counsel for Dr. Upadhye. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability), the Committee found that Dr. Upadhye committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of patients.
Disposition
On January 18, 2021, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Upadhye attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Upadhye’s certificate of registration for four months commencing Feb. 1, 2021
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Upadhye’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order
• Dr. Upadhye pay costs to the College in the amount of $6000.00
The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released on April 9, 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 15, 2021
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
NOTE: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective December 19, 2017.
Download Full Document (PDF)