THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:21:11 PM
Hodaie, Mojgan
CPSO#:
70218
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
4W W - 443
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6441
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:07 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOJGAN HODAIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODAIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2003 |