THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:04:14 AM
Cagiannos, Ilias
CPSO#:
69081
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71258
Fax: (613) 739-6860
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ILIAS CAGIANNOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAGIANNOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2002 |