THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:48:54 AM
Law, Peter
CPSO#:
69001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2001 |