THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:58:45 PM
Al-Bakkal, Sahar
CPSO#:
68085
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAHAR AL-BAKKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BAKKAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1998 |