THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:22:51 AM
Myint, Wunna Aung
CPSO#:
67814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site |
Minden |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WUNNA AUNG MYINT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYINT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |