THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:26:46 AM
Ghazavi, Mohammad Taghi
CPSO#:
67809
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
307-2130 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1R 3A6
Phone: 4167516141
Fax: 4167515270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TAGHI GHAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 14 Mar 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2008 |